LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 525868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 July 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 January 2019 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 January 2019 703 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required