BLESSED TRINITY R.C. COLLEGE PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 526620
Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £11.62k £5.62k £5.06k £4.87k £4.87k
Total expenditure £6.67k £10.98k £5.62k £4.57k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A