Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES I C W COWLEY LANGUAGE COLLEGE

Charity number: 526708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 August 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required