Financial history CEDARS CHARITABLE TRUST, GATESHEAD

Charity number: 527416
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £1.01k £1.20k £5 £931 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A