Financial history OLD FREE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527497
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.50k £7.12k £8.03k £18.55k £13.96k
Total expenditure £18.63k £4.96k £11.31k £19.78k £9.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k