THE SUTTON ST JAMES' FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATION AND THE POOR

Charity number: 527757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.89k £22.48k £23.22k £22.97k £23.78k
Total expenditure £11.35k £11.03k £9.41k £12.35k £15.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A