Accounts and annual returns THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 528243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 February 2018 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required