Financial history THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 528243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.62k £3.90k £3.99k £4.08k £4.15k
Total expenditure £2.25k £5.65k £1.99k £1.86k £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A