BROOKE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £771 £786 £802 £802 £834
Total expenditure £750 £750 £775 £775 £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A