THE SMITH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 529132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.67m £4.20m £4.88m £5.46m £6.54m
Total expenditure £3.80m £4.13m £4.50m £4.94m £5.78m
Income from government contracts £3.38m £3.56m £4.58m £5.16m £6.17m
Income from government grants £221.97k £628.01k £31.15k £49.36k £70.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.66m £4.18m £4.87m £5.45m £6.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.21k £14.11k £10.29k £9.60k £12.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.66m £4.01m £4.34m £4.76m £5.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.87k £13.97k £14.84k £18.35k £18.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £133.41k £120.15k £158.70k £171.98k £167.34k