THE AMPLEFORTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 529626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 November 2016 On time Download