AINTHORPE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 529690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.78k £8.90k £9.78k £9.78k £8.63k
Total expenditure £4.50k £4.51k £4.63k £4.62k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A