THE YORKSHIRE PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 529709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE BROPHY Chair 11 September 2013 None on record
Dr ROGER MARTIN PINDER Trustee 25 July 2011 None on record
Robert George Pauer Trustee 02 June 2015 None on record
Dr PETER JOHN HOGARTH Trustee None on record
Jonathan Bernard Coulson Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Dr Dorothy Arkell Nott Trustee 05 June 2018
SHELDON MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
Dr ANDREW KENNETH GEORGE JONES Trustee 01 October 2012 None on record
Professor Andrew Charles Marvin Trustee 04 June 2019 None on record
CAROLE YVONNE SMITH Trustee None on record
Felicity Helen Easdale Hurst Trustee 02 June 2015 None on record