Financial history ST AIDAN'S COLLEGE CHARITY

Charity number: 529981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.49k £8.59k £8.71k £8.86k £8.30k
Total expenditure £9.14k £9.80k £9.80k £5.73k £4.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A