Trustees ST AIDAN'S COLLEGE CHARITY

Charity number: 529981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND CANON JOHN EDWARD WILLIAM BOWERS Chair
None on record
Brian Crabtree Trustee 11 February 2020
None on record
Revd Canon Sarah Fenby Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
Rev Nicholas John McKee Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
The Reverend Canon Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
Revd Dr Michael Leyden Trustee 02 May 2018
None on record
Rev William Letheren Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
Rev Christopher Quine Trustee 05 November 2014
None on record
SYDNEY DAVID FORD Trustee 14 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST KIRBY
Received: On time