Trustees LUCILLA DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 700241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM ALDRIDGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dawn Louise Cooney | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mercer | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fleming | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Broom | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAT JONES | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANS DODD | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE JACQUELINE GODFREY | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RONALD WORSTER-DAVIS OBE JP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE BROOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE QUIRKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.