Financial history ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 701433
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £5.40k £5.40k £4.66k £4.65k £4.94k
Total expenditure £5.25k £5.25k £4.60k £4.69k £4.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A