ST HELEN'S SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 701581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required