ST HELEN'S SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 701581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £462 £106 £7 £38 £18
Total expenditure £0 £18.82k £0 £0 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A