Financial history THE CELLAR TRUST

Charity number: 701982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £953.78k £1.20m £1.44m £1.74m £2.26m
Total expenditure £888.67k £1.15m £1.44m £1.53m £1.76m
Income from government contracts £158.12k £281.76k N/A £250.30k £337.12k
Income from government grants £506.90k £519.57k £1.16m £677.46k £826.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £41.93k £39.16k £1.21m £1.52m £2.12m
Income - Other trading activities £92.05k £0 £0 £0 £110
Income - Charitable activities £763.83k £1.10m £144.30k £31.67k £73.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £55.30k £60.79k £79.95k £70.78k £65.51k
Income - Other £664 £0 £383 £112.78k £6.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £853.69k £1.12m £1.35m £1.46m £1.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.98k £37.61k £90.46k £62.53k £45.06k
Expenditure - Governance £19.44k £5.96k £5.11k £4.80k £4.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.08k £15.73k