Trustees THE CELLAR TRUST

Charity number: 701982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Samantha McLean Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Melvyn John Ingleson Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Gabriela Voinea Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Dr Shehla Khalid Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Dr Udy Archibong Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Samantha Rouse Trustee 23 February 2021
None on record
Richard Carroll Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
Hugh ROLO Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Laura Flatman Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record