Accounts and annual returns BRIDGE MEADOW HAVERFORDWEST TRUST

Charity number: 702158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 June 2019 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required