Financial history BRIDGE MEADOW HAVERFORDWEST TRUST

Charity number: 702158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.88k £18.90k £36.52k £51.99k £13.97k
Total expenditure £55.21k £22.98k £38.03k £51.99k £13.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £17.61k N/A