Financial history SADDLEWORTH OUTDOOR PURSUITS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £8.86k £5.76k £5.00k £4.95k £14.52k
Total expenditure £8.38k £9.34k £8.41k £8.41k £7.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k