BUMPY LIMITED

Charity number: 702335
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £257.98k £241.73k £382.42k £362.45k £405.09k
Total expenditure £284.98k £301.14k £358.49k £397.67k £411.79k
Income from government contracts £43.28k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £4.50k £4.00k £4.00k N/A