BUMPY LIMITED

Charity number: 702335
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2017 23 days late Download