AGE CONCERN BENTHAM CLUB

Charity number: 702481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 April 2019 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 April 2019 67 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required