AGE CONCERN BENTHAM CLUB

Charity number: 702481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £23.34k £25.01k £22.05k £21.98k £1.69k
Total expenditure £18.91k £18.91k £20.37k £20.37k £2.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £9.09k £3.99k £3.99k N/A