DAUBHILL MUSLIM SOCIETY

Charity number: 702789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zaid Yacoob Ghanchi Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
ABDULLAH ADAM I PATEL Trustee None on record
SHOAIB LIMBADA Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
IQBAL YAKUB PATEL Trustee 12 March 2006 None on record
Zainul Abedin PATEL Chair 01 April 2021 None on record
HANIF GOOLAM MAHOMED Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
MAHMED KAJEE Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
YUNUS ADAM Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Ayub Adam Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
RASHID JANGHARIA Trustee None on record