8TH COVENTRY (ST NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 702865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2021 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required