Financial history Vale Wildlife Hospital

Charity number: 702888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £515.85k £675.63k £649.63k £645.23k £728.63k
Total expenditure £486.95k £531.07k £649.40k £690.16k £598.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £28.89k £37.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £237.38k £325.13k £247.26k £345.61k £463.35k
Income - Other trading activities £278.37k £334.76k £388.48k £293.24k £259.16k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £100 £15.74k £13.88k £6.37k £6.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £6.54k £0 £125.81k £0 £771
Expenditure - Charitable activities £397.93k £529.66k £0 £0 £548.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £89.02k £1.41k £569.49k £631.52k £959
Expenditure - Governance £3.84k £17.20k £0 £0 £7.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £79.90k £58.64k £49.39k