Accounts and annual returns Vale Wildlife Hospital

Charity number: 702888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 14 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 14 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 12 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 12 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window