THE BLACK COUNTRY GROUNDWORK TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 702917
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1566 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1566 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1932 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1932 days
Annual return 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2297 days
Annual return 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3027 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3027 days