BEATRICE FOTHERBY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 702969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £319 £375 £402 £17.61k £0
Total expenditure £0 £450 £1.30k £9.54k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A