DRIVE

Charity number: 703002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.13m £13.51m £14.75m £15.91m £17.18m
Total expenditure £12.30m £13.37m £14.71m £15.67m £17.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £11.24m £11.72m £13.20m £14.42m
Income from government grants £10.22m £244.87k £975.08k £1.01m £896.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.70k £0 £1.22k £381 £50
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.12m £13.50m £14.73m £15.89m £17.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.54k £6.52k £5.28k £12.39k £15.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £11.10k £450 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.30m £13.37m £14.71m £15.67m £17.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.96k £88.80k £97.13k £94.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0