DRIVE

Charity number: 703002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karmeno Gauci Trustee 04 October 2016 None on record
Hugh Irwin Chair 18 February 2014 None on record
JEAN GREGSON Trustee
PEOPLE FIRST BRIDGEND Received: On time
BAD BIKES YOUTH PROJECT Received: On time
GEOFF LAKE Trustee None on record
Richard Troote Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
Chris Kitching Trustee 28 November 2017 None on record
Jenny Jones Trustee 20 June 2014 None on record
KATRINA KUROWSKI Trustee 22 November 2016
Tanio Ltd. Received: On time
JOHN MINKES Trustee
PENCARE Received: On time
Anthony Isingrini Trustee 04 October 2016 None on record
JANET SHELDON Trustee None on record