BROOK YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 703015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Daly Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
David Clark Trustee 11 September 2019
YOUTH ACCESS Received: On time
Leon Ward Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record
Chris Martin Trustee 07 June 2017
THE MENTAL HEALTH FOUNDATION Received: On time
Scott Nicholas Bennett Chair 26 July 2011
DUCHY HEALTH CHARITY LIMITED Received: On time
CORNWALL NEIGHBOURHOODS FOR CHANGE LIMITED Received: On time
TIMOTHY MACRAE TOD Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
Pamela Leonce Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
Maxine Evans Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Laura Jane Russell Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record