ROYAL HALLAMSHIRE HOSPITAL CRITICAL CARE AND STROKE APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 703021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £264 £1.12k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A