Financial history THE CHAMPNISS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £30.70k £84.40k £150.10k £182.28k £180.32k
Total expenditure £68.50k £74.58k £111.77k £129.63k £80.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A