Financial history ST CRISPIN'S PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £12.00k £12.22k £11.33k £5.30k £7.56k
Total expenditure £23.60k £12.36k £12.96k £1.84k £3.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A