Accounts and annual returns WAKEFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 800079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window