Financial history WAKEFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 800079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £55.10k £61.89k £66.00k £47.52k £53.00k
Total expenditure £47.74k £48.22k £65.66k £59.13k £67.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A