THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, BISHOPS TAWTON

Charity number: 800539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021
Total gross income £180 £752 £981 £423 £120
Total expenditure £0 £3.50k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A