THE DAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £161.83k £165.65k £165.65k £162.34k £181.87k
Total expenditure £108.54k £128.53k £128.53k £156.47k £176.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £11.20k