Y M C A BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 801035
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 January 2017 On time Download