Financial history 198 CONTEMPORARY ARTS AND LEARNING LTD

Charity number: 801614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £186.02k £229.08k £872.44k £814.59k £483.43k
Total expenditure £159.93k £191.62k £243.26k £268.15k £313.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £100.00k £486.16k £338.70k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £872.37k £54.66k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £759.91k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £69 £23 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £227.17k £268.15k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £16.09k £0 N/A