G & S SINGERS

Charity number: 802005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.36k £3.05k £9.33k £4.49k £1.56k
Total expenditure £1.31k £4.10k £7.99k £4.39k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A