G & S SINGERS

Charity number: 802005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 23 August 1989: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 22 June 2015: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 July 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE GREAT YARMOUTH GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property