ST GEORGE'S COMMUNITY CHILDREN'S PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 802017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £929.90k £980.76k £1.10m £1.08m £1.10m
Total expenditure £844.44k £953.87k £983.17k £1.05m £1.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £213.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £157.92k £0 £251.80k £236.26k £274.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.19k £19.79k £25.64k £16.33k £173.66k
Income - Other trading activities £38.86k £34.15k £28.88k £27.65k £11.76k
Income - Charitable activities £889.71k £926.75k £1.05m £1.04m £916.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £138 £69 £36 £142 £210
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £830.64k £925.98k £953.20k £1.02m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.79k £27.89k £29.97k £33.98k £21.41k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0