THE W H AND A HAWKINS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download